WA SB5073 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the medical use of cannabis.
Title
Concerning the medical use of cannabis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-21 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-04-29 | Chapter 181, 2011 Laws PV. | |
2011-04-29 | Governor partially vetoed. | |
2011-04-22 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-22 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-22 | President signed. | |
2011-04-21 | Passed final passage; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-04-21 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2011-04-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-04-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-11 | Committee amendment adopted as amended. | |
2011-04-07 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2011-03-31 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-31 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-03-31 | WAYS - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2011-03-31 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-03-31 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-30 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-25 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-03-23 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-03-23 | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2011-03-23 | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-03-23 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 9:00 AM. | |
2011-03-14 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-04 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. | |
2011-03-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-03-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-02 | Floor amendment | |
2011-03-02 | 2nd substitute bill substituted | |
2011-02-28 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-25 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-02-25 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-25 | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-02-10 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-02-10 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2011-02-10 | HEA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-09 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-20 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-12 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1100 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.