WA SB5069 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Early Learning & K-12 Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Early Learning & K-12 Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning access to state career and technical course equivalencies.
Title
Concerning access to state career and technical course equivalencies.
Sponsors
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1424 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5069&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5069.pdf |