WA SB5066 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-21 - Scheduled for executive session in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Hearing: Jan 19 @ 10:30 am in Senate Committee on Law & Justice
Hearing: Jan 21 @ 10:30 am in Senate Committee on Law & Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a peace officer's duty to intervene.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning a peace officer's duty to intervene.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-21SenateScheduled for executive session in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM
2021-01-19SenateScheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2021-01-05SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1093New CodeSee Bill Text
43101New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback