WA SB5063 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-21 - Scheduled for executive session in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks Committee
Hearing: Jan 21 @ 1:30 pm in Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Park
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the expiration date of the invasive species council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the expiration date of the invasive species council.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-21SenateScheduled for executive session in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM
2021-01-14SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.
2021-01-05SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
79a25310Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback