WA SB5061 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-18 - Scheduled for executive session in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 9:00 AM
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs Committee
Hearing: Jan 18 @ 9:00 am in Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning unemployment insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning unemployment insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-18SenateScheduled for executive session in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 9:00 AM
2021-01-13SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs.
2021-01-05SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1098 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-11 - First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28b50030Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5004New CodeSee Bill Text
5004323Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5012New CodeSee Bill Text
5016030Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5020010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5020020Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5020050Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
5020100Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5020118Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5020120Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50201201Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
50201202Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
5020140Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5024014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5029021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5029025Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
5029026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5029027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5029041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5029062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5029063Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5044060Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5060New CodeSee Bill Text
5060020Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5060110Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback