WA SB5059 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing the legislative gift center to sell products produced in Washington by craft distillers and microbreweries.
Title
Allowing the legislative gift center to sell products produced in Washington by craft distillers and microbreweries.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |