WA SB5059 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Addressing motor vehicle property offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing motor vehicle property offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2018-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-23SenatePlaced on Rules White Sheet.
2017-04-23HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2017-03-09HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:30 AM.
2017-02-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety
2017-02-08SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2017-02-08SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-02-01SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-01-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2017-01-25SenateLAW - Majority; do pass.
2017-01-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
2017-01-18SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
2017-01-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback