WA SB5057 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
Pending: Senate State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
Pending: Senate State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the removal of an adjudicative proceeding to the office of administrative hearings.
Title
Authorizing the removal of an adjudicative proceeding to the office of administrative hearings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5057&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5057.pdf |