WA SB5054 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning impaired driving.
Title
Concerning impaired driving.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. James McCune [R] |
Sen. Shelly Short [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: do pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: do pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-02-24 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-24 | House | PS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-04-25 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-23 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-18 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-03 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 7; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2020-12-31 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 61 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 61 | 504 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 61 | 5055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 94a | 030 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 94a | 190 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 94a | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 94a | 505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 94a | 525 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 94a | 633 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 94a | 6332 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 94a | 660 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 94a | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |