WA SB5052 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of health equity zones.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the creation of health equity zones.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness
2021-02-26SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2021-02-26SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-26SenateFloor amendment
2021-02-26Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2021-02-23SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-19SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-17SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-17SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-17SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-17SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2021-01-27SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-01-27SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-01-27SenateHLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-18SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2020-12-31SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4370New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5052&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5052.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5052-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5052-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5052-S2.E.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5052-S2%20AMS%20MUZZ%20S1660.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5052-S2%20AMS%20MUZZ%20S1694.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5052-S2%20AMS%20RIVE%20S1692.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5052-S2%20AMS%20SHOR%20S1645.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5052-S2%20AMS%20SHOR%20S1689.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5052-S2%20AMS%20WAGO%20S1647.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5052-S2%20AMS%20WARN%20S1646.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5052-S2%20AMS%20WILS%20S1662.1.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5052%20SBA%20HLTC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5052%20SBR%20HLTC%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5052%20SBR%20HLTC%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5052%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5052%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5052%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5052-S2.E%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123126&actionText=HLTC%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28405&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123126&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28635&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123126&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-26-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5052&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback