WA SB5050 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Business, Financial Services & Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Business, Financial Services & Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning real estate firms and brokers.
Title
Concerning real estate firms and brokers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade. |
2020-12-31 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 85 | 275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 85 | 361 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |