WA SB5050 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Banning the sale of assault weapons and large capacity magazines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Banning the sale of assault weapons and large capacity magazines.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-01-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Same As/Similar To

HB1134 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-21 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback