WA SB5042 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the effective date of certain actions taken under the growth management act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the effective date of certain actions taken under the growth management act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: do pass (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-30SenateEffective date 6/9/2022.
2022-03-30SenateChapter 218, 2022 Laws.
2022-03-30SenateGovernor signed.
2022-03-09SenateDelivered to Governor.
2022-03-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2022-03-08SenatePresident signed.
2022-03-03HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2022-03-03HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2022-03-02HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2022-02-23HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2022-02-22HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2022-02-22HouseMinority; do not pass.
2022-02-22HouseENVI - Majority; do pass.
2022-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM.
2022-02-17HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM.
2022-02-01HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment & Energy.
2022-01-26SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2022-01-26SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2022-01-21SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2022-01-10SenateOn motion, referred to Rules Committee for second reading.
2022-01-10SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2021-03-17SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2021-02-12SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-01-28SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-01-28SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-01-28SenateHLG - Majority; do pass.
2021-01-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-12SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Housing & Local Government.
2020-12-29SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3670aNew CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5042&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5042.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Passed%20Legislature/5042.PL.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session%20Laws/Senate/5042.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5042%20AMS%20BRAU%20S1145.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5042%20AMS%20FORT%20S1155.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5042%20AMS%20RIVE%20S1146.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5042%20AMS%20SHOR%20S1142.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5042%20AMS%20SHOR%20S1147.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5042%20AMS%20WARN%20S1156.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5042%20AMS%20SALO%20S1757.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5042%20AMS%20SALO%20S1757.3.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5042%20AMS%20FORT%20S1882.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5042%20AMS%20FORT%20S1890.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5042%20AMS%20FORT%20S1902.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5042%20AMS%20FORT%20S1903.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5042%20AMS%20BRAU%20S3767.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5042%20AMS%20FORT%20S3769.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5042%20AMS%20FORT%20S3770.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5042%20AMS%20FORT%20S3771.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5042%20AMS%20FORT%20S3772.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5042%20AMS%20RIVE%20S3768.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5042%20AMS%20SHOR%20S3763.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5042%20AMS%20SHOR%20S3766.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5042%20AMS%20SHOR%20S4026.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5042%20AMS%20WARN%20S3765.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/5042%20AMH%20DYEM%20HATF%20107.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5042%20SBA%20HLG%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5042%20SBR%20HLG%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5042%20SBR%20HLG%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5042%20SBR%202ND%2022.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5042%20SBR%20APS%2022.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5042%20HBA%20ENVI%2022.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5042%20HBR%20ENVI%2022.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5042%20HBR%20APH%2022.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5042%20SBR%20FBR%2022.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123108&actionText=HLG%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28376&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123108&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=01-26-2022&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5042&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123108&actionText=ENVI%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=29850&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123108&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-03-2022&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5042&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback