WA SB5042 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing funeral planning and funeral services as noninsurance benefits under group life and disability insurance policies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing funeral planning and funeral services as noninsurance benefits under group life and disability insurance policies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-17SenateEffective date 7/23/2017.
2017-04-17SenateChapter 32, 2017 Laws.
2017-04-17SenateGovernor signed.
2017-04-11SenateDelivered to Governor.
2017-04-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-04-06SenatePresident signed.
2017-04-05HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2017-04-05HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-03-31HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-03-20HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-03-15HouseBFS - Majority; do pass.
2017-03-15HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM.
2017-03-03HouseFirst reading, referred to Business & Financial Services
2017-03-01SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-03-01SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-03-01SenateFloor amendment
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-02-14SenateOn motion, referred to Rules Green Sheet for second reading.
2017-01-23SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2017-01-19SenateFI - Majority; do pass.
2017-01-19SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:00 AM.
2017-01-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance.

Same As/Similar To

HB1081 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - Referred to Business & Financial Services.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback