WA SB5042 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Providing a business and occupation tax credit for businesses that hire veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing a business and occupation tax credit for businesses that hire veterans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2016-02-25SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2016-01-11SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-06-28SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-05-29SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-04-29SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-04-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2015-04-02SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2015-04-02SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2015-04-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:00 PM.
2015-03-25SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2015-01-12SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2015-01-05SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1241 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback