WA SB5042 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Narrowing the business and occupation tax deduction for investment and related income.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Narrowing the business and occupation tax deduction for investment and related income.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2013-05-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2013-02-14SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2013-01-15SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback