WA SB5042 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing a waiver of penalties for first-time paperwork violations by small businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing a waiver of penalties for first-time paperwork violations by small businesses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-06 Effective date 7/26/2009.
2009-05-06 Chapter 358, 2009 Laws.
2009-05-06 Governor signed.
2009-04-23 Delivered to Governor.
2009-04-21 Speaker signed.
2009-04-19 President signed.
2009-04-18 Passed final passage; yeas, 43; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 6.
2009-04-18 Senate concurred in House amendments.
2009-04-13 Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2009-04-13 Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2009-04-13 Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments.
2009-04-09 Placed on second reading.
2009-04-06 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2009-04-04 WAYS - Majority; do pass with amendment
2009-04-04 WAYS - Executive action taken by committee.
2009-04-04 Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2009-04-02 Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2009-03-27 Referred to Ways & Means.
2009-03-26 SGTA - Majority; do pass with amendment
2009-03-26 SGTA - Executive action taken by committee.
2009-03-26 Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM.
2009-03-05 Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:45 AM.
2009-02-02 First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs.
2009-01-30 Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 2.
2009-01-30 Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2009-01-30 1st substitute bill substituted
2009-01-30 Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
2009-01-30 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2009-01-30 EDTI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2009-01-29 Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 10:00 AM.
2009-01-14 Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 8:00 AM.
2009-01-12 First reading, referred to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation.
2009-12-15 Prefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1650 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback