WA SB5037 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Early Learning & K-12 Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Early Learning & K-12 Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing transparent school opening metrics tied to COVID-19 prevalence.
Title
Establishing transparent school opening metrics tied to COVID-19 prevalence.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Sharon Brown [R] | Sen. Perry Dozier [R] |
Sen. Jeff Holy [R] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] |
Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2020-12-24 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURE
COVID-19 AND CORONAVIRUS
EMERGENCY, STATE OF
GOVERNOR
HEALTH DEPARTMENTS, LOCAL
HEALTH, DEPARTMENT
HEALTH, STATE BOARD OF
SCHOOLS AND SCHOOL DISTRICTS
COVID-19 AND CORONAVIRUS
EMERGENCY, STATE OF
GOVERNOR
HEALTH DEPARTMENTS, LOCAL
HEALTH, DEPARTMENT
HEALTH, STATE BOARD OF
SCHOOLS AND SCHOOL DISTRICTS
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 630 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 06 | 220 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 20 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 70 | 130 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 05 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |