WA SB5036 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating expiration dates for the derelict vessel and invasive species removal fee.
Title
Eliminating expiration dates for the derelict vessel and invasive species removal fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-04-27 | Chapter 169, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-04-27 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-19 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-18 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-15 | President signed. | |
2011-04-14 | Passed final passage; yeas, 37; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2011-04-14 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2011-04-07 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2011-04-07 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-07 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2011-04-06 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2011-03-31 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-28 | APPG - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2011-03-28 | APPG - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-03-28 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations & Oversight at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-24 | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations & Oversight at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-23 | First reading, referred to General Government Appropriations & Oversight. | |
2011-02-22 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2011-02-22 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-22 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-02-01 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-01-28 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-01-27 | NRMW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-01-26 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Marine Waters at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Marine Waters at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-10 | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Marine Waters. | |
2011-01-06 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1395 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.