WA SB5032 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Labor & Commerce.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Implementing family and medical leave insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Implementing family and medical leave insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08SenateDue to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Labor & Commerce.
2018-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 12:00 PM.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-01-30SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports.

Same As/Similar To

HB1116 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - Referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback