WA SB5031 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Addressing licensing and enforcement provisions applicable to money transmitters and currency exchanges under the uniform money services act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing licensing and enforcement provisions applicable to money transmitters and currency exchanges under the uniform money services act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-17SenateEffective date 7/23/2017.
2017-04-17SenateChapter 30, 2017 Laws.
2017-04-17SenateGovernor signed.
2017-04-13SenateDelivered to Governor.
2017-04-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-04-10SenatePresident signed.
2017-04-07HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2017-04-07HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-04-06HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-03-07HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-03-02HouseBFS - Majority; do pass.
2017-03-02HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:00 AM.
2017-02-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Business & Financial Services
2017-02-08SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2017-02-08SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-02-08Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2017-02-01SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-01-16SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2017-01-12SenateFI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-01-12SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:00 AM.
2017-01-10SenateFirst reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance.

Same As/Similar To

HB1045 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-21 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback