WA SB5031 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring actions for damage to real property resulting from construction, alteration, or repair on adjacent property to be commenced within two years after the property owner first discovered or reasonably should have discovered the damage.
Title
Requiring actions for damage to real property resulting from construction, alteration, or repair on adjacent property to be commenced within two years after the property owner first discovered or reasonably should have discovered the damage.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Padden [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-04-17 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-04-03 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-02 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-04-02 | House | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-04-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-15 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice . |