WA SB5027 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning closed captioning on televisions in places of public accommodation.
Title
Concerning closed captioning on televisions in places of public accommodation.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Jesse Salomon [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] |
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Chapter 229, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-04-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-05 | House | Committee amendment |
2021-03-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-19 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:30 AM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |