WA SB5025 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Scheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 10:00 AM
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Business Committee
Hearing: Mar 10 @ 8:00 am in House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business
Hearing: Mar 11 @ 10:00 am in House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the consumer protection improvement act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the consumer protection improvement act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11HouseScheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 10:00 AM
2021-03-10HouseScheduled for public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM
2021-02-26HouseFirst reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business.
2021-02-24SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-02-24SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-24Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-17SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-01-29SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-01-28SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-01-28SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-01-28SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-21SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-14SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2020-12-18SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1986010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1986080Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1986140Amended CodeSee Bill Text
416160Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5025&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5025.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5025-S.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5025-S%20AMS%20FORT%20S1445.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5025-S%20AMS%20FORT%20S1446.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5025-S%20AMS%20HONE%20S1432.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5025-S%20AMS%20PADD%20S1433.1.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5025%20SBA%20LAW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5025%20SBR%20LAW%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5025%20SBR%20LAW%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5025-S%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123068&actionText=LAW%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28351&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123068&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-24-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5025&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback