WA SB5020 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning certain state ethnic and cultural diversity commissions.
Title
Concerning certain state ethnic and cultural diversity commissions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Chapter 143, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 1. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2018-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee amendment |
2018-02-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-21 | House | SEIT - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-21 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill not substituted. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government. |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |