WA SB5017 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying school district procurement requirements for personal service contracts for construction management, value engineering, constructibility review, and building commissioning. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Clarifying school district procurement requirements for service contracts for construction management, value engineering, constructibility review, and building commissioning.)
Title
Clarifying school district procurement requirements for personal service contracts for construction management, value engineering, constructibility review, and building commissioning. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Clarifying school district procurement requirements for service contracts for construction management, value engineering, constructibility review, and building commissioning.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: do pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: do pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | Governor vetoed. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-04 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-28 | House | CB - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-25 | House | Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-04-25 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-31 | House | CB - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-23 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |