WA SB5015 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reestablishing the productivity board.
Title
Reestablishing the productivity board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 106, 2023 Laws. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-04-04 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2023-04-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-04-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-03-28 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-10 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 60 | 015 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 60 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 60 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 60 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 60 | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 60 | 150 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |