WA SB5014 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning determination of the benchmark rate in Snohomish county for certain community residential services.
Title
Concerning determination of the benchmark rate in Snohomish county for certain community residential services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-10 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 11:00 AM. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2017-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1062 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.