WA SB5012 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-25 - Scheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM
Pending: Senate State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Hearing: Jan 18 @ 1:30 pm in Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Electio
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning governmental continuity during emergency periods.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning governmental continuity during emergency periods.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-25SenateScheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
2018-12-07SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1077 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-23 - Scheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 8:00 AM

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback