WA SB5010 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning protected lands not being assessed local fire district levies.
Title
Concerning protected lands not being assessed local fire district levies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Chapter 178, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee amendment |
2019-03-29 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-20 | House | LG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |