WA SB5009 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the uniform public expression protection act.
Title
Enacting the uniform public expression protection act.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Sharon Brown [R] | Sen. James McCune [R] |
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Chapter 259, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-04-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-09 | House | Committee amendment |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-24 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-02 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
CIVIL ACTIONS AND PROCEDURE
CONSTITUTION, STATE
CONSTITUTION, U.S.
LEGISLATURE
NAMED ACTS
OPEN PUBLIC MEETINGS
CONSTITUTION, STATE
CONSTITUTION, U.S.
LEGISLATURE
NAMED ACTS
OPEN PUBLIC MEETINGS
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
4 | 24 | 525 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |