WA SB5006 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying waiver of firearm rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifying waiver of firearm rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass with amendment(s) by Civil Rights & Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-04SenateEffective date 7/23/2023.
2023-05-04SenateChapter 262, 2023 Laws.
2023-05-04SenateGovernor signed.
2023-04-19SenateDelivered to Governor.
2023-04-18HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-04-18SenatePresident signed.
2023-04-13SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 33; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2023-04-13SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2023-03-24HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 35; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2023-03-24HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2023-03-24HouseCommittee amendment
2023-03-23HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2023-03-21HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2023-03-17HouseMinority; do not pass.
2023-03-17HouseCRJ - Majority; do pass with amendment
2023-03-17HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM.
2023-03-14HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM.
2023-02-17HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.
2023-02-15SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2023-02-15SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2023-02-15Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2023-02-01SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2023-01-20SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2023-01-19SenateMinority; do not pass.
2023-01-19SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2023-01-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
2023-01-12SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
2023-01-09SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2022-12-05SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
941New CodeSee Bill Text
941010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
941040Amended CodeSee Bill Text
941350Amended CodeSee Bill Text
941352Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5006&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5006.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5006-S.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Passed%20Legislature/5006-S.PL.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Session%20Laws/Senate/5006-S.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5006-S%20AMS%20PADD%20S1255.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5006-S%20AMS%20TORR%20S1257.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5006-S%20AMS%20WAGO%20S1252.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5006-S%20AMS%20WILS%20S1256.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/5006-S%20AMH%20CRJ%20H1685.2.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5006%20SBA%20LAW%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5006%20SBR%20LAW%20TA%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5006%20SBR%20LAW%20OC%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5006-S%20SBR%20APS%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5006-S%20HBA%20CRJ%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5006-S%20HBR%20CRJ%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5006-S%20SBR%20HA%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5006-S%20HBR%20APH%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5006-S%20SBR%20FBR%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=65437
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=65982
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=126825&actionText=LAW%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=30332&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=126825&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-15-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5006&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=126825&actionText=CRJ%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29%20by%20Civil%20Rights%20%26amp%3B%20Judiciary.&mId=30951&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=126825&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-24-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5006&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=126825&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-13-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5006&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback