WA SB5005 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Identifying certain water rights held by municipal water suppliers as water rights available for municipal water supply purposes.
Title
Identifying certain water rights held by municipal water suppliers as water rights available for municipal water supply purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | AWTE - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development. |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1084 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5005&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5005.pdf |