WA SB5004 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing animal care and control agencies and nonprofit humane societies to provide additional veterinary services to low-income households.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing animal care and control agencies and nonprofit humane societies to provide additional veterinary services to low-income households.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-04-26SenateChapter 142, 2019 Laws.
2019-04-26SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-22SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-18HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-15SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-04-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-08HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-02HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-02HouseRDAN - Majority; do pass.
2019-04-02HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-22HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources.
2019-02-25SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-02-25SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-25Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-11SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-08SenateHLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-08SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-06SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2018-12-03SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5004&year=2019
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5004.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5004-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5004-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5004-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=116951&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-25-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5004&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=116951&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-12-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5004&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback