WA HJR4210 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Amending the state Constitution to provide governmental continuity during emergency periods resulting from a catastrophic incident.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the state Constitution to provide governmental continuity during emergency periods resulting from a catastrophic incident.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2018-02-09HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-06HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-06HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-06HouseAPP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Public Safety.
2018-02-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-01HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-23HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2018-01-18HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-18HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-01-18HousePS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-18HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-11HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety
2017-12-06HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SJR8211 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback