WA HJR4209 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring extraordinary revenue growth to be transferred to the budget stabilization account.
Title
Requiring extraordinary revenue growth to be transferred to the budget stabilization account.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-16 | Work session in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-09 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=4209&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Joint Resolutions/4209.pdf |