WA HJM4025 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Honoring Vietnam veterans.
Title
Honoring Vietnam veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-24 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-23 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-15 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2010-02-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-12 | Placed on third reading. | |
2010-02-12 | Committee recommendations adopted. | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-29 | SGTA - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-01-29 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-29 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-19 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SJM8021 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.