WA HJM4003 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government and Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government and Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Petitioning the government of Turkey to respect the property rights and human rights of the Ecumenical Patriarchate.
Title
Petitioning the government of Turkey to respect the property rights and human rights of the Ecumenical Patriarchate.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Hinkle [R] | Rep. Deb Wallace [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. | |
2010-01-11 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-17 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-13 | SGTA - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-13 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-13 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-15 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=4003&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Joint Memorials/4003-Government of Turkey.pdf |