WA HJM4000 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Supporting the continued research, development, production, and application of biochar from our forests and agricultural lands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting the continued research, development, production, and application of biochar from our forests and agricultural lands.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-01-29HouseRDAN - Majority; do pass.
2019-01-29HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-23HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources.
2018-12-06HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SJM8005 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-14 - Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback