WA HJM4000 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Transportation.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Transportation.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting that Interstate 5 be named the "Purple Heart Trail."
Title
Requesting that Interstate 5 be named the "Purple Heart Trail."
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Hayes [R] | Rep. Larry Seaquist [D] | Sen. Drew MacEwen [R] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] |
Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2014-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-03-13 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2013-02-07 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-04 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-04 | House | TR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2013-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2013-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SJM8001 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-26 - Filed with Secretary of State.