WA HB3179 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Revising local excise tax provisions for counties and cities.
Title
Revising local excise tax provisions for counties and cities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-19 | Chapter 127, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-19 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | President signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-09 | Passed final passage; yeas, 58; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-09 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 18; absent, 1; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-05 | Committee amendment adopted as amended. | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-03-01 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-03-01 | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-03-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-03-01 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-27 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. | |
2010-02-22 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-22 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-22 | GO - Majority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-18 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2010-02-18 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 51; nays, 47; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-02-16 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-16 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-16 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-13 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-09 | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-09 | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-09 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-08 | First reading, referred to Finance. |