WA HB3141 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Redesigning the delivery of temporary assistance to needy families.
Title
Redesigning the delivery of temporary assistance to needy families.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] | Rep. Phyllis Kenney [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Eric Pettigrew [D] |
Rep. Larry Seaquist [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-04-01 | Chapter 273, 2010 Laws PV. | |
2010-04-01 | Governor partially vetoed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Passed final passage; yeas, 57; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-03-06 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-03-01 | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-03-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-03-01 | Public hearing, executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-26 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-26 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-26 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-26 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-26 | HSC - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. | |
2010-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 51; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-13 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-13 | 2nd substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-09 | WAYS - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-09 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-09 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:00 PM. | |
2010-02-06 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-02 | ELCS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-02 | ELCS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Children's Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-29 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Children's Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-27 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Children's Services. |