WA HB3124 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a report to child protective services when a child is present in the vehicle of a person arrested for driving or being in control of a vehicle while under the influence of alcohol or drugs.
Title
Requiring a report to child protective services when a child is present in the vehicle of a person arrested for driving or being in control of a vehicle while under the influence of alcohol or drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-25 | Chapter 214, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-25 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | President signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-11 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-11 | Senate insists on its position and asks House to concur. | |
2010-03-10 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. | |
2010-03-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-09 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-09 | Returned to second reading for amendment. | |
2010-03-09 | Rules suspended. | |
2010-03-09 | Senate receded from amendments. | |
2010-03-06 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. | |
2010-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-04 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-01 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | HSC - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. | |
2010-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-13 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-29 | ELCS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-29 | ELCS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-29 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Children's Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-28 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Children's Services at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-27 | Referred to Early Learning & Children's Services. | |
2010-01-27 | Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2010-01-26 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |