WA HB3066 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating uniformity among annual tax reporting survey provisions.
Title
Creating uniformity among annual tax reporting survey provisions.
Sponsors
Rep. Cary Condotta [R] | Rep. Deborah Eddy [D] | Rep. Kevin Parker [R] | Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] |
Rep. Deb Wallace [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-18 | Chapter 114, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-18 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-05 | President signed. | |
2010-03-04 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-27 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-02-27 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-24 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-22 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-10 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-29 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-01-29 | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-29 | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-29 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-22 | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6326 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.