WA HB3061 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing claims of insolvent self-insurers under industrial insurance.
Title
Addressing claims of insolvent self-insurers under industrial insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-25 | Chapter 213, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-25 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | President signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | LCCP - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on third reading. | |
2010-02-10 | Committee recommendations adopted. | |
2010-02-09 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-02 | CL - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-02 | CL - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-27 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-22 | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6732 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.