WA HB3030 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding the administration of irrigation districts.
Title
Regarding the administration of irrigation districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Fagan [R] | Rep. Bill Hinkle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-24 | Chapter 201, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-24 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | President signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-09 | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-09 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-05 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-01 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | ARED - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture & Rural Economic Development at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-22 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture & Rural Economic Development at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Rural Economic Development. | |
2010-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-01 | LGH - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-01 | LGH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-01 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-28 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-20 | First reading, referred to Local Government & Housing. |