WA HB3003 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Effective date 6/8/2018**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Effective date 6/8/2018**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to law enforcement.
Title
Relating to law enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Effective date 6/8/2018**. |
2018-03-08 | House | Chapter 10, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Held on calendar. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 3:00 PM. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2018-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 73; nays, 25; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-07 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-03-07 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2018-03-06 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-03-06 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 9:00 AM. |
2018-02-26 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |