WA HB2996 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Including approved private schools in the superintendent of public instruction's record check information rules.
Title
Including approved private schools in the superintendent of public instruction's record check information rules.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-17 | Chapter 100, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-17 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-05 | President signed. | |
2010-03-04 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-27 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 9. | |
2010-02-27 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | EDU - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-22 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on third reading. | |
2010-02-10 | Committee recommendations adopted. | |
2010-02-09 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-02 | ED - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-02 | ED - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-26 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-20 | First reading, referred to Education. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6619 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.