WA HB2989 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Funding the business license account created in RCW 19.02.210 through a charge imposed by the secretary of state on annual report filings by certain legal entities.
Title
Funding the business license account created in RCW 19.02.210 through a charge imposed by the secretary of state on annual report filings by certain legal entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2018-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2989&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2989.pdf |