WA HB2986 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the appointment of nonvoting labor members to public transportation governing bodies.
Title
Requiring the appointment of nonvoting labor members to public transportation governing bodies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-04-01 | Chapter 278, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-04-01 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Passed final passage; yeas, 63; nays, 32; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-03-06 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-01 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-26 | GO - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2010-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 66; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-13 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-13 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-27 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-01-27 | LGH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-27 | LGH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-27 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-25 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-19 | First reading, referred to Local Government & Housing. |